Global Patent Index - EP 1098697 A1

EP 1098697 A1 2001-05-16 - PROCESS FOR MATERIALS CONVERSION UNDER TAYLOR EDDY CURRENT CONDITIONS IN A TAYLOR REACTOR WITH A REACTOR GAP REGION HAVING INCREASING OR DECREASING GAP SIZE, IN THE COURSE OF WHICH A CHANGE IN VISCOSITY OF THE REACTION MEDIUM OCCURS

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR MATERIALS CONVERSION UNDER TAYLOR EDDY CURRENT CONDITIONS IN A TAYLOR REACTOR WITH A REACTOR GAP REGION HAVING INCREASING OR DECREASING GAP SIZE, IN THE COURSE OF WHICH A CHANGE IN VISCOSITY OF THE REACTION MEDIUM OCCURS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STOFFUMWANDLUNG UNTER TAYLORWIRBELSTRÖMUNGBEDINGUNGEN IN EINEM TAYLORREAKTOR MIT VERBREITERTER ODER VERENGTER RINGSPALTE, BEI DEREN VERLAUF EINE ÄNDERUNG DER VISKOSITÄT DES REAKTIONSMEDIUMS EINTRITT

Title (fr)

TRANSFORMATIONS DE MATIERES ACCOMPAGNEES D'UNE MODIFICATION DE LA VISCOSITE)DU MILIEU DE REACTION DANS DES CONDITIONS DE MELANGE TURBULENT DE TAYLOR DANS UN REACTEUR DE TAYLOR AYANT DES DISTANCES DE SEPARATION ENTRE LES ELEMENTS ROTATIFS ET STATIQUES DU REACTEUR ETANT CROISANTES OU DECROISANTES

Publication

EP 1098697 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929311 A

Priority

  • DE 19828742 A
  • EP 9904370 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828742A1] Viscosity change commences during reaction. The geometrical form of the reactor wall (1) and/or rotor (2), over the entire length, satisfies conditions for Taylor vortex flow in the reactor volume (5). The outer reactor wall and rotor of the Taylor reactor turn in the same direction. Angular velocity of the rotor exceeds that of the wall, which may be stationary. They are both circular in cross section, along their entire lengths. The reactor is vertical; reaction medium moves against gravity. The rotor is mounted centrally. The product outlet (7) is mounted at the highest point of the reactor cover. Outer wall and rotor diverge in the direction of flow, the rotor circumference remaining constant, rising or falling. The outer wall is frustrated conical, or includes an assembly of several such sections. Conformations are such that the annular gap between rotor and wall, narrows in the direction of flow. The rotor circumference changes as before. Reactions may take place in succession along the reactor. An inlet (6) is used to dose material and catalysts for second, third or further reactions. An Independent claim covers use of the reactor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 19/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/1806 (2013.01); B01J 19/1887 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00051 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00162 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00168 (2013.01); B01J 2219/182 (2013.01); B01J 2219/185 (2013.01); B01J 2219/187 (2013.01); B01J 2219/1946 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000280A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828742 A1 19991230; BR 9911650 A 20010320; EP 1098697 A1 20010516; JP 2002519174 A 20020702; US 7122161 B1 20061017; WO 0000280 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101231

2010-09-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR MATERIALS CONVERSION UNDER TAYLOR EDDY CURRENT CONDITIONS IN A TAYLOR REACTOR WITH A REACTOR GAP REGION HAVING INCREASING OR DECREASING GAP SIZE, IN THE COURSE OF WH

2010-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASF COATINGS GMBH

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040813

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL