Global Patent Index - EP 1098710 A1

EP 1098710 A1 2001-05-16 - PRECIPITATING TUBE BUNDLE FOR WET ELECTROFILTERS

Title (en)

PRECIPITATING TUBE BUNDLE FOR WET ELECTROFILTERS

Title (de)

NIEDERSCHLAGSROHRBÜNDEL FÜR NASSELEKTROFILTER

Title (fr)

FAISCEAU DE TUBES DE PRECIPITATION DESTINE A DES ELECTROFILTRES HUMIDES

Publication

EP 1098710 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936591 A

Priority

  • DE 19833226 A
  • EP 9905248 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0004996A1] The invention relates to a precipitating tube bundle for wet electrofilters. Said precipitating tube bundle consists of several single-piece precipitating tubes which are held, at a distance from each other, by an upper support collar, a central guide ring and a lower guide ring. The advantages of the invention are that the tube bundle is economical and simple to produce, that individual tubes can be replaced and that when an electrical breakdown occurs in one of the precipitation tubes, the adjacent tubes are not damaged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 3/16; B03C 3/53; B03C 3/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/16 (2006.01); B03C 3/53 (2006.01); B03C 3/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/86 (2013.01); B03C 3/16 (2013.01); B03C 3/49 (2013.01); B03C 3/53 (2013.01); Y10S 55/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0004996A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0004996 A1 20000203; AT 226850 T 20021115; CA 2338461 A1 20000203; CA 2338461 C 20080527; CZ 20010252 A3 20010912; CZ 300234 B6 20090325; DE 19833226 C1 20000420; DK 1098710 T3 20030303; EP 1098710 A1 20010516; EP 1098710 B1 20021030; ES 2186390 T3 20030501; HU 0103540 A2 20020128; HU 0103540 A3 20020228; HU 225176 B1 20060728; PL 194625 B1 20070629; PL 345599 A1 20011217; US 6599349 B1 20030729

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20181029

2018-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170722

2018-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-06-04 [REG BE MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170722

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170722

2018-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170801

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170722

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180103

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180330

2018-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170722

2018-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 226850 T

- Effective date: 20170722

2018-03-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170801

2018-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-02-26 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGRI BE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2015-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEULER-INDUSTRIEWERKE GMBH

- Free text: STEULER-INDUSTRIEWERKE GMBH#POSTFACH 1448 GEORG-STEULER-STRASSE 175#D-56203 HOEHR-GRENZHAUSEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- STEULER-INDUSTRIEWERKE GMBH#POSTFACH 1448 GEORG-STEULER-STRASSE 175#D-56203 HOEHR-GRENZHAUSEN (DE)

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1098710E

2003-07-22 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-07-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186390 T3

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-03-03 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903267 20021205

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 226850 T 20021115

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE