Global Patent Index - EP 1098720 A1

EP 1098720 A1 2001-05-16 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRE-WORK OF POSTAL DELIVERIES

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRE-WORK OF POSTAL DELIVERIES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR VORBEREITUNG FÜR POSTAUSLIEFERUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET APPAREIL POUR LA PREPARATION DE LA DISTRIBUTION DU COURRIER

Publication

EP 1098720 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00925312 A

Priority

  • FI 0000374 W
  • FI 990976 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0066284A1] The present invention relates to a method and apparatus for pre-work of postal deliveries. The entire production chain is based on an alphabetical sorting system in which the deliveries are sorted directly to the delivery order.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 7/02; B07C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/00 (2006.01); B07C 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0066284A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0066284 A1 20001109; AU 4406900 A 20001117; AU 785295 B2 20070104; EP 1098720 A1 20010516; EP 1098720 B1 20040225; FI 115036 B 20050228; FI 990976 A0 19990429; FI 990976 A 20001030; RU 2004111659 A 20050310; RU 2273532 C2 20060410

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090428

2010-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ITELLA OYJ

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080401

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080421

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-06-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SUOMEN POSTI OYJ

- Effective date: 20071212

2008-06-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ITELLA OYJ

2008-06-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SUOMEN POSTI OY

2008-02-29 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: ITELLA OYJ

- Effective date: 20080219

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE FR IT NL

2003-04-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030207

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE