Global Patent Index - EP 1098736 A1

EP 1098736 A1 2001-05-16 - A SPLICED ABRASIVE WEB AND METHOD FOR THE SAME

Title (en)

A SPLICED ABRASIVE WEB AND METHOD FOR THE SAME

Title (de)

SCHLEIFBAND MIT NAHTSTELLE UND VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

TOILE ABRASIVE SANS FIN ET PROCEDE DE JOINTURE

Publication

EP 1098736 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902996 A

Priority

  • US 9900218 W
  • US 11947798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005034A1] A spliced abrasive web (10) spliced together with splicing medium (16) including a predetermined pattern (18). A preferred embodiment of the invention provides a non-woven abrasive web, in the form of a belt, spliced together with splicing medium (16) including a predetermined pattern (18). Also disclosed is a method for splicing the abrasive web (10) by pressing a knurled surface (32) against the splicing medium (16) to thereby impart a pattern (18) on the splicing medium (16) corresponding generally to the knurled surface (32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 11/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0005034A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005034 A1 20000203; WO 0005034 A8 20010503; AU 2311899 A 20000214; DE 69903823 D1 20021212; EP 1098736 A1 20010516; EP 1098736 B1 20021106; JP 2002521217 A 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-02-07 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030207

2003-02-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903823 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB