Global Patent Index - EP 1098739 A1

EP 1098739 A1 2001-05-16 - ELECTRIC RAZOR

Title (en)

ELECTRIC RAZOR

Title (de)

TROCKENRASIERAPPARAT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE RASAGE A SEC

Publication

EP 1098739 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931195 A

Priority

  • DE 19832473 A
  • EP 9904446 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005040A1] The invention relates to an electric razor with a casing having a casing part (G), and at least one cutting element that can move back and forth on a horizontal plane (E) in addition to an interchangeable frame (WR) with at least one cutting element (S) which is removably retained by at least two locking devices (R1, R2; R3, R4) on the casing part (G), wherein the locking devices (R1, R2; R3, R4) are formed by a locating surface (20, 21) provided on the interchangeable frame (WR) and by a locating surface (80, 90) of a spring mounted locking element (18, 19) exerting a locking force (FR), wherein a retaining function and a vibration-free positioning function of the interchangeable frame (WR) on the casing part (G) may be carried out using the locking devices (R1, R2; R3, R4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/04 (2006.01); B26B 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/048 (2013.01); B26B 19/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0005040A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005040 A1 20000203; AT 217239 T 20020515; AU 4778599 A 20000214; CN 1112985 C 20030702; CN 1308571 A 20010815; DE 19832473 C1 20000330; EP 1098739 A1 20010516; EP 1098739 B1 20020508; JP 2002521104 A 20020716; JP 4316142 B2 20090819; US 2002020066 A1 20020221; US 6415513 B1 20020709; US 6560875 B1 20030513

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120626

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120626

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120626

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120626

2013-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 217239 T

- Effective date: 20120626

2013-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130101

2012-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRAUN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120630

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110705

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110615

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110603

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110608

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901406 20020613

2002-06-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020509

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217239 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001202

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL