Global Patent Index - EP 1098740 A1

EP 1098740 A1 2001-05-16 - ELECTRIC RAZOR

Title (en)

ELECTRIC RAZOR

Title (de)

TROCKENRASIERAPPARAT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE RASAGE A SEC

Publication

EP 1098740 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934538 A

Priority

  • DE 19832475 A
  • EP 9904447 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005041A1] The invention relates to an electric razor with an electric drive (A) provided in a casing (1) and a casing part (G), wherein an interchangeable frame (WR) with at least one cutting element (S) is retained by at least one locking device (R), wherein the interchangeable frame (WR) is moveably held by a retaining device (HV) in a holding position after the interchangeable frame (WR) is released by the locking device (R). At least one space (W, W1) is provided between a wall of the interchangeable frame (WR) and a wall of the casing part (G) in the holding position and the interchangeable frame (WR) can be set in motion by the drive (A).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 19/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/02 (2006.01); B26B 19/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/3853 (2013.01); B26B 19/02 (2013.01); B26B 19/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0005041A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005041 A1 20000203; AT 215873 T 20020415; AU 5028899 A 20000214; CN 1107574 C 20030507; CN 1310660 A 20010829; DE 19832475 C1 20000309; EP 1098740 A1 20010516; EP 1098740 B1 20020410; JP 2002521105 A 20020716; JP 4309058 B2 20090805; US 2001003870 A1 20010621; US 6381849 B2 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901209

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110603

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100626

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090626

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090626

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090626

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRAUN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080701

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-09-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901209 20020516

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215873 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001202

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL