Global Patent Index - EP 1098754 A1

EP 1098754 A1 2001-05-16 - COMPACTING INSTALLATION FOR A POWDER COMPACTING MACHINE

Title (en)

COMPACTING INSTALLATION FOR A POWDER COMPACTING MACHINE

Title (de)

KOMPAKTIERWERK FÜR EINE PULVERVERDICHTUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE COMPACTAGE POUR MACHINE DE COMPACTAGE DE POUDRE

Publication

EP 1098754 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99947216 A

Priority

  • DE 9902197 W
  • DE 19832520 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19832520A1] The invention relates to a compacting installation (9) of a powder compacting machine in which the compacting elements (10, 11) can be removed from the compacting housing in a transversal manner with regard to the direction of the drive shafts (17, 18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 11/16; B30B 3/04; B30B 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 3/00 (2006.01); B30B 3/04 (2006.01); B30B 11/16 (2006.01); B30B 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/18 (2013.01); B30B 3/04 (2013.01); B30B 11/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0005062A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19832520 A1 20000210; DE 19832520 B4 20050324; AT 235368 T 20030415; EP 1098754 A1 20010516; EP 1098754 B1 20030326; ES 2190659 T3 20030801; JP 2002521203 A 20020716; JP 3997055 B2 20071024; PT 1098754 E 20030829; US 7112052 B1 20060926; WO 0005062 A1 20000203

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170815

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904755

- Representative's name: RIEDER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSANWALT, DE

2011-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59904755

- Representative's name: RIEDER & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSAN, DE

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HUGEN, THOMAS

- Free text: HUGEN, THOMAS#EIPRINGHAUSEN 44#42929 WERMELSKIRCHEN (DE) $ TELLER, BERND#AM SCHIMMELSKAEMPCHEN 9#40699 ERKRATH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HUGEN, THOMAS#EIPRINGHAUSEN 44#42929 WERMELSKIRCHEN (DE) $ TELLER, BERND#AM SCHIMMELSKAEMPCHEN 9#40699 ERKRATH (DE)

2005-05-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-07-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040720

2004-07-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-07-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-07-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190659 T3

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-19 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030719

2003-07-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030719

2003-07-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030714

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030714

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-09 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030709

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030707

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904755 P 20030430

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011127

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE