Global Patent Index - EP 1098755 A1

EP 1098755 A1 2001-05-16 - BAG HANDLE AND METHOD AND MEANS OF ATTACHMENT

Title (en)

BAG HANDLE AND METHOD AND MEANS OF ATTACHMENT

Title (de)

BEUTELGRIFF SOWIE VERFAHREN UND MITTEL ZU SEINER BEFESTIGUNG

Title (fr)

POIGNEE DE SAC ET PROCEDE ET MOYEN DE FIXATION

Publication

EP 1098755 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99915369 A

Priority

  • AU 9900308 W
  • AU PP317698 A
  • AU PP460598 A
  • AU PP742498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955524A1] A handle (30, 40) applying method and means employs heating and deforming an aglet (32) to form or fusing an end stop on a bag cord after fitting the cord through a handle locating aperture (31, 32, 41, 42) in a bag wall (15) or fitting an aglet (32) having a resiliently movable barb (64) or detent on the end of a bag cord before passing the aglet through a handle locating aperture which causes the barb (64) or detent to move toward the aglet as it passes through the aperture and which barb (64) or detent returns to its rest position to restrain the cord from removal through the aperture in a reverse direction to that of fitment of the cord end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 1/86; B65B 61/14; B65D 25/28; B65D 33/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/86 (2006.01); B31B 19/86 (2006.01); B65B 61/14 (2006.01); B65D 25/28 (2006.01); B65D 33/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/12 (2013.01); B65B 61/14 (2013.01); B31B 70/864 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955524 A1 19991104; CN 1139519 C 20040225; CN 1354713 A 20020619; EP 1098755 A1 20010516; EP 1098755 A4 20030402; HK 1047258 A1 20041021; JP 2002512906 A 20020508; NZ 507660 A 20020628

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-04-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 31B 1/86 A, 7B 65B 61/14 B, 7B 65D 25/28 B, 7B 65D 33/12 B, 7B 31B 19/86 B

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HANDLETEC PTY LTD

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001025;LT PAYMENT 20001025;LV PAYMENT 20001025;MK PAYMENT 20001025;RO PAYMENT 20001025;SI PAYMENT 20001025