Global Patent Index - EP 1098768 A1

EP 1098768 A1 2001-05-16 - PRINTING UNIT WITH SYNCHRONISED CONTROL FOR ROTARY OR FLAT SILK-SCREEN PRINTING MACHINES

Title (en)

PRINTING UNIT WITH SYNCHRONISED CONTROL FOR ROTARY OR FLAT SILK-SCREEN PRINTING MACHINES

Title (de)

DRUCKEINHEIT MIT SYNCHRONISIERTER STEUERUNG FÜR ROTATIONS- ODER FLACHSIEBDRUCKMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

UNITE D'IMPRESSION A COMMANDE SYNCHRONISEE POUR MACHINES DE SERIGRAPHIE SUR ROTATIVE OU A PLAT

Publication

EP 1098768 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922162 A

Priority

  • EP 9903009 W
  • IT MI980854 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954138A1] A printing unit for rotary, frame or cylinder (20) silk-screen printing machines, which are used for printing of substrates, and in particular textiles. Two spindles (50) for each printing unit drive a ring (30) of the printing cylinder (20), whereas each spindle (50) is controlled by means of a brushless-type electric motor (60), an epicycloidal reduction gear (70) with reduced play, a toothed drive belt (10), and ball bearings which have a small cross section, such that the digital drives of the electric motors (60) control the speed of the motors (60) in a closed loop. The digital drives are in turn controlled by axis control cards which are integrated in a PLC, in order to obtain synchronisation of the motion of the cylinders (20) and of the conveyor belt (40) for the substrate to be printed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 15/08; B41F 13/004

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/004 (2006.01); B41F 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/0809 (2013.01); B41F 13/0045 (2013.01); B41F 15/0836 (2013.01); B41P 2213/70 (2013.01); B41P 2213/72 (2013.01); B41P 2215/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954138A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954138 A1 19991028; AT 222536 T 20020915; AU 3930699 A 19991108; DE 69902593 D1 20020926; DE 69902593 T2 20030703; EP 1098768 A1 20010516; EP 1098768 B1 20020821; IT 1303912 B1 20010301; IT MI980854 A1 19991022

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130416

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69902593

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2013-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 222536 T

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-11-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131101

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120413

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090416

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-07-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: S.A.S. STAMPERIA OLONIA DI MAURO MIELE & C.

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: S.A.S. STAMPERIA OLONIA DI MAURO MIELE & C.

2003-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: S.A.S. STAMPERIA OLONIA DI MAURO MIELE & C.

2002-12-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902593 20020926

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL PT

2002-08-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222536 T 20020915

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL PT