Global Patent Index - EP 1098773 A1

EP 1098773 A1 2001-05-16 - PRINTING DEVICE WITH AT LEAST TWO WORKING AREAS SPATIALLY SEPARATED FROM EACH OTHER

Title (en)

PRINTING DEVICE WITH AT LEAST TWO WORKING AREAS SPATIALLY SEPARATED FROM EACH OTHER

Title (de)

DRUCKVORRICHTUNG MIT MINDESTENS ZWEI RÄUMLICH VONEINANDER GETRENNTEN ARBEITSBEREICHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION COMPORTANT AU MOINS DEUX ZONES DE TRAVAIL SEPAREES SPATIALEMENT L'UNE DE L'AUTRE

Publication

EP 1098773 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945028 A

Priority

DE 9802064 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005074A1] The invention relates to a printing device with at least two working areas spatially separated from each other, each of which has a separate advance device (34, 36; 42, 44) for a printing pattern (28, 30; 41) assigned to the corresponding working area, with at least one printing head (16) and a carrier (14) which can be displaced crosswise along the direction of the printed line on the working area of the printing head (16) and is mounted on the printing head (16) in such a way that it can be displaced between the working positions assigned to the working areas. The printing head (16) is an ink printing head that may be displaced on the carrier (14) in an inoperative position differing from the working positions and that may be displaced together with the carrier (14) in the direction of the printed lines between a printing station encompassing the working area and a maintenance station (46) located outside the working area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 25/304; B41J 11/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/18 (2006.01); B41J 2/185 (2006.01); B41J 11/48 (2006.01); B41J 25/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/48 (2013.01); B41J 25/304 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0005074A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005074 A1 20000203; DE 59805928 D1 20021114; EP 1098773 A1 20010516; EP 1098773 B1 20021009; ES 2185216 T3 20030416; JP 2002521232 A 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805928

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090723

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090724

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090724

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090723

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090723

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185216 T3

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805928 20021114

2002-10-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020204

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI