Global Patent Index - EP 1098786 A1

EP 1098786 A1 2001-05-16 - LIGHT BAR HAVING MULTIPLE LEVELS AND MULTIPLE ROWS OF LIGHTS AND HAVING END EXTENSIONS

Title (en)

LIGHT BAR HAVING MULTIPLE LEVELS AND MULTIPLE ROWS OF LIGHTS AND HAVING END EXTENSIONS

Title (de)

LICHTSTAB MIT MEHREREN REIHEN VON LEUCHTEN UND MEHREREN BELEUCHTUNGSSTÄRKEN UND ENDERWEITERUNGEN DAVON

Title (fr)

BARRE LUMINEUSE DE SIGNALISATION COMPORTANT DES NIVEAUX MULTIPLES ET DES RANGEES MULTIPLES DE FEUX, ET EQUIPEE D'EXTENSIONS D'EXTREMITE

Publication

EP 1098786 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99937299 A

Priority

  • US 9916267 W
  • US 9496398 P
  • US 17307598 A
  • US 17241798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006420A1] A light bar (100) for mounting on an emergency vehicle to provide warning light signals. An elongate body portion (102) has an elongate axis (104), the elongate body portion adapted to be mounted on the emergency vehicle so that the elongate axis (104) traverses an axis (106) coaxial with the direction of the travel of the emergency vehicle. At least three vertically spaced lighting layers (118, 122, 130) are provided, each layer having at least one emrgency light source, the emergency light sources on each layer cooperating to provide a transient high intensity warning light signal 360 degrees around the light bar (100). At least four linear rows (142, 144, 146, 148) of emergency light sources as viewed from the top of the light bar are also provided, the rows being substantially parallel to the elongate axis (104), each row having at least two emergency light sources, at least one row located in each of the layers (118, 122, 130) and at least one layer having at least two rows.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60Q 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60Q 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60Q 1/2611 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006420 A1 20000210; WO 0006420 A9 20000727; AU 5216399 A 20000221; AU 756276 B2 20030109; CA 2336690 A1 20000210; CA 2336690 C 20120327; EP 1098786 A1 20010516; EP 1098786 A4 20050209

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070209

2006-11-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-02-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041223

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI