Global Patent Index - EP 1098822 A1

EP 1098822 A1 2001-05-16 - PANEL INTERLOCKING MEANS

Title (en)

PANEL INTERLOCKING MEANS

Title (de)

VERRIEGELUNGSMITTEL FUER WANDUNGEN

Title (fr)

MOYENS DE VERROUILLAGE DE VOLETS

Publication

EP 1098822 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99933591 A

Priority

  • GB 9814407 A
  • US 9914600 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001591A1] Panel interlocking means (20) and a carton blank incorporating panel interlocking means for securing together a first and a second panel (10, 12) in overlapping relationship, said panel interlocking means (20) comprising a locking tab (22) struck from said first panel (10), and a retaining tab (42) defining a locking aperture (43) struck from said second panel (12), wherein the retaining tab (42) is displaced out of the plane of said second panel (12) to receive said locking tab (22) through the locking aperture (43) to be engaged therewith, wherein the second panel (10, 12) further comprises flexural means (52) to receive the locking tab (22) and to enable an edge of the locking aperture (43) to be displaced out of the plane of the second panel (12) thereby to enable the locking tab (22) to move readily through said locking aperture (43).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/20 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00185 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00277 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0066 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00716 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001591A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001591 A1 20000113; AT 248759 T 20030915; AU 4961799 A 20000124; BR 9911827 A 20010327; BR 9911827 B1 20090505; DE 69911031 D1 20031009; DE 69911031 T2 20040708; DK 1098822 T3 20031222; EP 1098822 A1 20010516; EP 1098822 B1 20030903; ES 2207257 T3 20040516; GB 9814407 D0 19980902; PT 1098822 E 20031231; SE 1098822 T3 20030903; SE 1098822 T5 20030903

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170705

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170605

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69911031

- Representative's name: CORINNA VOSSIUS IP GROUP PATENT- UND RECHTSANW, DE

2013-07-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69911031

- Representative's name: PATRONUS IP PATENT- & RECHTSANWAELTE BERNHARD , DE

2013-07-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69911031

- Representative's name: CORINNA VOSSIUS IP GROUP PATENT- UND RECHTSANW, DE

2013-07-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69911031

- Representative's name: CORINNA VOSSIUS IP GROUP PATENT- UND RECHTSANW, DE

2013-07-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69911031

- Representative's name: PATRONUS IP PATENT- & RECHTSANWAELTE BERNHARD , DE

2011-02-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100107

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090629

2010-03-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080628

2008-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLCONE HIGH RIDGE

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-06-15 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207257 T3

2004-04-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2004-03-02 [REG SE RPOT] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED WITH A CORRECTED SWEDISH TRANSLATION

2004-03-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 12/2003, PAGE 1955: CORR.: MEAD WESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC.

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2003-12-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2003-11-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030404147

2003-10-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2003-10-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911031 P 20031009

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CARTON PANEL INTERLOCKING MEANS

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE