Global Patent Index - EP 1098884 A1

EP 1098884 A1 2001-05-16 - IL-8 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

IL-8 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

IL-8-REZEPTOR-ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DE RECEPTEUR D'IL-8

Publication

EP 1098884 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98937163 A

Priority

US 9815533 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005216A1] This invention relates to novel compounds of Formula (II), and compositions thereof, useful in the treatment of disease states mediated by the chemokine, Interleukin-8 (IL-8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 231/56; A61K 31/415

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61K 31/416 (2006.01); A61K 31/428 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 39/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 231/56 (2006.01); C07D 275/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 275/06 (2013.01); C07D 231/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005216 A1 20000203; AU 8594198 A 20000214; BR 9815951 A 20010306; CA 2338741 A1 20000203; CN 1314893 A 20010926; EP 1098884 A1 20010516; EP 1098884 A4 20030122; HU 0102863 A2 20020328; HU 0102863 A3 20020528; IL 140983 D0 20020210; JP 2002521368 A 20020716; NO 20010353 A 20010122; NO 20010353 D0 20010122; PL 346178 A1 20020128; TR 200100219 T2 20010621

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1037957

2007-05-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061003

2004-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040713

2003-01-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021211

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 231/56 A, 7C 07D 275/06 B, 7A 61K 31/415 B

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010130