Global Patent Index - EP 1098893 A1

EP 1098893 A1 2001-05-16 - CYCLIC COMPOUNDS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF DYSLIPIDEMIA, ATHEROSCLEROSIS AND DIABETES, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND PREPARATION PROCESS

Title (en)

CYCLIC COMPOUNDS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF DYSLIPIDEMIA, ATHEROSCLEROSIS AND DIABETES, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND PREPARATION PROCESS

Title (de)

ZYKLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN DIE ANWENDUNG FINDEN BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON DYSLIPIDÄMIEN, ATHEROSKLEROSE UND DIABETIS, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSES CYCLIQUES UTILES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE DYSLIPIDEMIE, D'ATHEROSCLEROSE ET DE DIABETES, COMPOSITIONS PAHARMACEUTIQUES ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1098893 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99934643 A

Priority

  • EP 9904831 W
  • FR 9809164 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2781222A1] New cyclic compounds and their salts are new. Cyclic compounds are of formula (I): X, Y = CH2, O, S o NRa; R = H, 1-7C alkyl, phthalamido-(1-7C) alkyl, 3-12C cycloalkyl, (CH2)pCOORb or 6-10C aryl or 3-10-membered heterocycle comprising 1-4 endocyclic heteroatoms of O, S and N (both optionally substituted by one or more of Z or 1-7C alkylene), 6-10C aryl-(1-7C) alkyl; R1 = H, 1-7C alkyl, 1-7C hydroxyalkyl, 6-10C aryl (optionally substituted by one or more of W), P(O)(OR8)(OR9), (CH2)tCOORc or CONR10R11; R2, R3 = H, 1-7C alkyl, 3-12C cycloalkyl, 6-10C aryl, 6-10C aryl-(1-7C) alkyl, 3-10-membered heterocycle comprising 1-4 endocyclic heteroatoms of O, S and N or fluorenyl (aryl, heterocycle and fluorenyl optionally substituted by one or more of Z or 1-7C alkylene) or, together, R2 and R3 form (CH2)r1 or group of formula (a); and R4-R7 = H, 1-7C alkyl or 6-10C aryl or 3-10-membered heterocycle comprising 1-4 endocyclic heteroatoms of O, S and N (optionally substituted by one or more of Z), provided that: (i) when R2, R3, R5 and R7 = H, X, Y = O, R4 = CH3 and R6 = H or CH3, then R1 and R, together with the C to which they are attached, do not form C(CH3)(COOCH3), C(CH3)(CH2OH), C(C6H5)(COOCH3) or C(C6H5)(CH2OH); and (ii) when R4-R7 = H, X, Y = O and R = pyridyl or optionally substituted piperidyl, then R1 is not optionally substituted phenyl. An Independent claim is also included for intermediate diols chosen from 2,2-bis-(4-fluorophenyl)propane-1,3-diol, 2,2-bis(3-trifluoromethylphenyl)propane-1,3-diol, 5-hydroxymethyl-5H-dibenzo(a,d)cyclohepten-5-ylmethanol and (9-hydroxymethyl-9H-xanthen-9-yl)methanol.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 319/06; A61K 31/335; C07D 319/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/357 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/4035 (2006.01); A61K 31/443 (2006.01); A61K 31/4433 (2006.01); A61K 31/453 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); C07C 33/36 (2006.01); C07C 33/46 (2006.01); C07D 311/82 (2006.01); C07D 319/06 (2006.01); C07D 319/08 (2006.01); C07D 405/06 (2006.01); C07D 407/04 (2006.01); C07D 409/04 (2006.01); C07D 493/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 319/08 (2013.01); C07D 319/06 (2013.01); C07D 405/06 (2013.01); C07D 407/04 (2013.01); C07D 409/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0004011A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2781222 A1 20000121; AT 235485 T 20030415; AU 5034799 A 20000207; AU 753287 B2 20021017; BR 9912138 A 20010410; CA 2337481 A1 20000127; CN 1309655 A 20010822; DE 69906303 D1 20030430; DE 69906303 T2 20031211; DK 1098893 T3 20030707; EP 1098893 A1 20010516; EP 1098893 B1 20030326; ES 2192853 T3 20031016; HU 0103411 A2 20020429; HU 0103411 A3 20020828; ID 27854 A 20010426; JP 2002520407 A 20020709; NO 20010266 A 20010116; NO 20010266 D0 20010116; PL 345397 A1 20011217; PT 1098893 E 20030829; SK 482001 A3 20010911; US 6528538 B1 20030304; WO 0004011 A1 20000127; ZA 200101303 B 20020515

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MERCK PATENT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040710

2005-07-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2005-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040709

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-28 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-02-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040709

2005-02-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MERCK PATENT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2005-01-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040710

2004-07-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040710

2004-07-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192853 T3

2003-09-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030926

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030813

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-22 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030722

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030718

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-18 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030718

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030717

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030717

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030714

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030711

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030711

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-11 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030711

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-10 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030710

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030709

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030707

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-01 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20030701

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-06-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030401831

2003-06-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906303 P 20030430

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV RO SI

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001121

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20001121;LV PAYMENT 20001121;RO PAYMENT 20001121;SI PAYMENT 20001121