Global Patent Index - EP 1098951 A1

EP 1098951 A1 2001-05-16 - FLAMEPROOFING AND FUNGICIDE AGENTS WHICH ARE BIOLOGICALLY SUITABLE FOR USE IN CONSTRUCTION, FOR INSULATING MATERIALS CONSISTING OF RENEWABLE RAW MATERIALS

Title (en)

FLAMEPROOFING AND FUNGICIDE AGENTS WHICH ARE BIOLOGICALLY SUITABLE FOR USE IN CONSTRUCTION, FOR INSULATING MATERIALS CONSISTING OF RENEWABLE RAW MATERIALS

Title (de)

BAUBIOLOGISCH UNBEDENKLICHE FLAMM- UND PILZSCHUTZMITTEL FÜR DÄMMSTOFFE AUS NACHWACHSENDEN ROHSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

AGENTS IGNIFUGES ET FONGICIDES BIOLOGIQUEMENT INOFFENSIFS POUR LES CONSTRUCTIONS ET DESTINES AUX MATERIAUX ISOLANTS EN MATIERES BRUTES DE DILATION SECONDAIRE

Publication

EP 1098951 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932750 A

Priority

  • DE 19829277 A
  • EP 9904492 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829277A1] The invention relates to a method for flameproofing insulating materials made with renewable raw materials. According to this method, the insulating material is impregnated with an aqueous impregnating solution containing 5 to 20 wt.% sodium and/or potassium carbonate as the flameproofing and fungicide agent and additionally, 2 to 10 wt.% of a tenside as a fungicide. The insulating materials are shavings of hemp, miscanthus, flax, jute and ramie and insulating matting consisting of fibres of hemp, miscanthus, flax, ramie and shorn wool.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 21/02; D06M 11/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 20/10 (2006.01); C04B 41/50 (2006.01); E04B 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 41/009 (2013.01); C04B 20/107 (2013.01); C04B 41/501 (2013.01); C04B 2111/28 (2013.01); E04B 2001/745 (2013.01); Y02A 30/245 (2018.01); Y02W 30/97 (2015.05)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C04B 20/107 + C04B 18/248
  2. C04B 41/501 + C04B 2103/69
  3. C04B 41/009 + C04B 18/248 + C04B 30/02

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000570A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829277 A1 20000105; EP 1098951 A1 20010516; WO 0000570 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030527

2001-09-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAEGELE, HELMUT

2001-09-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EISENREICH, NORBERT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DK ES FR GB IT NL