Global Patent Index - EP 1099014 A1

EP 1099014 A1 2001-05-16 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AT LEAST ONE SILICON CARBIDE MONOCRYSTAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AT LEAST ONE SILICON CARBIDE MONOCRYSTAL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG MINDESTENS EINES SiC-EINKRISTALLS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'AU MOINS UN MONOCRISTAL DE SiC

Publication

EP 1099014 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99942775 A

Priority

  • DE 9902066 W
  • DE 19831556 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19917601A1] A silicon carbide single crystal production apparatus comprises a crucible (20) with one or more vitreous carbon inserts (51). An Independent claim is also included for a silicon carbide single crystal production process in which heat flux (61) is controlled by one or more vitreous carbon inserts (51) within a crucible (20). Preferred Features: The crucible (20) is made of graphite and a vitreous carbon insert (51), especially in the form of a hollow cylindrical gas channel, is located between a solid SiC supply region (30) and a crucible wall (21) adjacent a crystal region (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C30B 23/00; C30B 29/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C30B 29/36 (2006.01); C30B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C30B 23/00 (2013.01); C30B 29/36 (2013.01); Y10T 117/10 (2013.01); Y10T 117/1092 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0004212A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19917601 A1 20000120; CN 1213177 C 20050803; CN 1308690 A 20010815; EP 1099014 A1 20010516; EP 1099014 B1 20020327; JP 2002520252 A 20020709; JP 4574853 B2 20101104; US 2001004875 A1 20010628; US 6344085 B2 20020205; WO 0004212 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SICRYSTAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SICRYSTAL AG, 90411 NUERNBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59901083

2018-06-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901083

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130705

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130706

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-19 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20130320

2013-01-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SICRYSTAL AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SICRYSTAL AG, 91052 ERLANGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59901083

- Effective date: 20121115

2013-01-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SICRYSTAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SICRYSTAL AG, 91052 ERLANGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59901083

- Effective date: 20121115

2013-01-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901083

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20121115

2013-01-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901083

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

- Effective date: 20121115

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120724

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-03-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-10-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SICRYSTAL AG

- Free text: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SICRYSTAL AG#PAUL-GOSSEN-STRASSE 100#91052 ERLANGEN (DE)

2004-10-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041013

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-10-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901083 20020502

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE