Global Patent Index - EP 1099019 A1

EP 1099019 A1 2001-05-16 - DEVICE FOR SIZING A FIBRE BUNDLE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SIZING A FIBRE BUNDLE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHLICHTEN EINER FADENSCHAR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENCOLLAGE D'UNE PORTEE DE FILS

Publication

EP 1099019 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936521 A

Priority

  • DE 19832163 A
  • EP 9904914 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19832163A1] A yarn sheet (3) is fed to a size applicator (2) through an inlet tension arrangement (1) which also performs the additional function of applying a pre-wetting agent (10,14), e.g. water at 85 deg C, and squeezing (7,15,16) the yarn sheet. The free path (17) to the size applicator is kept as short as possible and has a cover (19) to prevent heat loss.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 1/14; D06B 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 1/14 (2006.01); D06B 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 1/145 (2013.01); D06B 3/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0004219A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19832163 A1 20000120; DE 19832163 C2 20030828; CN 1181237 C 20041222; CN 1305548 A 20010725; EP 1099019 A1 20010516; EP 1099019 B1 20021023; EP 1099019 B2 20060927; ES 2188205 T3 20030616; JP 2002520507 A 20020709; JP 3640243 B2 20050420; WO 0004219 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080713

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060713

2007-01-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070107

2006-10-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-09-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2006-07-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-03-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

2005-12-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-12-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-07-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050708

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050705

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Free text: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.#BLUMENBERGER STRASSE 143-145#41061 MOENCHENGLADBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE)

2003-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VONDROVSKY, GABRIEL

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188205 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903182 20021128

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI