Global Patent Index - EP 1099024 A1

EP 1099024 A1 2001-05-16 - ANTIFALSIFICATION PAPER

Title (en)

ANTIFALSIFICATION PAPER

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSPAPIER

Title (fr)

PAPIER DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1099024 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931205 A

Priority

  • DE 19829004 A
  • EP 9904471 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829004A1] The invention relates to an antifalsification paper for producing valuable documents such as banknotes, passports, identity cards or similar. At least part of the inventive paper is provided with a coating which guarantees a longer period of circulation. Said coating is provided on at least one surface of the antifalsification paper and consists of a composition containing only one binder and no fillers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 19/10; D21H 21/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44F 1/12 (2006.01); D21H 19/10 (2006.01); D21H 21/40 (2006.01); D21H 19/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/40 (2013.01); D21H 19/10 (2013.01); D21H 19/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000697A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829004 A1 20000105; AT 259916 T 20040315; AU 4779099 A 20000117; CN 1238603 C 20060125; CN 1307658 A 20010808; DK 1099024 T3 20040621; EP 1099024 A1 20010516; EP 1099024 B1 20040218; EP 1365069 A2 20031126; EP 1365069 A3 20040609; ES 2216529 T3 20041016; ID 27465 A 20010412; PT 1099024 E 20040630; WO 0000697 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20080218

2007-02-13 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2006-10-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060313

2006-09-29 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20060804

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-09 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060313

2006-08-09 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20060313

2006-06-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060627

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060627

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060627

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060627

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-23 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060623

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-23 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060623

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060619

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-05 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20060405

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050822

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SICPA S.A.

2005-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH

2005-01-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SICPA S.A.

- Effective date: 20041118

2005-01-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH

- Effective date: 20041118

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216529 T3

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040427

2004-06-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-06-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401024

2004-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908592 P 20040325

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020111

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010129;LT PAYMENT 20010129;LV PAYMENT 20010129;MK PAYMENT 20010129;RO PAYMENT 20010129;SI PAYMENT 20010129