Global Patent Index - EP 1099051 B1

EP 1099051 B1 2002-11-27 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1099051 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99938184 A

Priority

  • DE 9901724 W
  • DE 19828085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828085A1] A procedure for operating an IC engine (1) especially of a car, has fuel injected either in a first operating mode during a compression phase or in a second operating mode during an induction phase directly into a combustion chamber (4).- DETAILED DESCRIPTION - There is changing over between the two operating methods. The operating parameters influencing the output torque of the engine in the two operating modes are controlled differently in open and/or closed loop fashion according to a torque demanded. The fuel quantity to be injected in the first operating mode is determined according to the operating parameters of the engine on the basis of the injections in the second operating mode

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/30; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3064 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02D 2041/389 (2013.01); F02D 2250/18 (2013.01); F02D 2250/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828085 A1 19991230; EP 1099051 A1 20010516; EP 1099051 B1 20021127; JP 2002519559 A 20020702; US 6474293 B1 20021105; WO 9967523 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903560

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903560

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090612

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903560 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT