Global Patent Index - EP 1099053 A1

EP 1099053 A1 2001-05-16 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1099053 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00925029 A

Priority

  • DE 0000703 W
  • DE 19923299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19923299A1] A procedure for the control of an IC engine that comprises devices which influence the exhaust of the engine, is described. With the existence of certain conditions, a special operating state is introduced in which an increased energy content of the exhaust is desired. In the special operating state, a combustion key point is influenced so that the exhaust temperature increases. The combustion key point is displaced in the direction of retardation. In the special operating state, at least one first and a second pre-injection takes place before a main injection. With the devices which influence the exhaust, a supercharger, a particle filter or a catalyser is meant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 37/00 (2006.01); B01D 46/42 (2006.01); F01N 3/02 (2006.01); F01N 3/023 (2006.01); F01N 9/00 (2006.01); F02D 23/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01); F02M 45/02 (2006.01); F01N 13/02 (2010.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/029 (2013.01); F01N 3/023 (2013.01); F01N 9/002 (2013.01); F01N 13/009 (2014.06); F02D 41/021 (2013.01); F02D 41/0275 (2013.01); F02D 41/1446 (2013.01); F02D 41/402 (2013.01); F02D 41/403 (2013.01); F02M 45/02 (2013.01); F01N 2250/02 (2013.01); F02D 41/0007 (2013.01); F02D 41/3809 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0812 (2013.01); Y02T 10/44 (2013.01); Y02T 10/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0071879A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19923299 A1 20001123; CN 1165678 C 20040908; CN 1306604 A 20010801; EP 1099053 A1 20010516; JP 2003500596 A 20030107; WO 0071879 A1 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20051222

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE