Global Patent Index - EP 1099055 A1

EP 1099055 A1 2001-05-16 - RADIAL PISTON ENGINE WITH ROLLER GUIDES

Title (en)

RADIAL PISTON ENGINE WITH ROLLER GUIDES

Title (de)

RADIALKOLBENMASCHINE MIT ROLLENFÜHRUNGEN

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A PISTONS RADIAUX AVEC ELEMENTS DE GUIDAGE DE GALETS

Publication

EP 1099055 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934645 A

Priority

  • DE 19832696 A
  • EP 9904835 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19832696A1] The radial piston machine has a displacement ring (5), a cylinder block (18) with cylinders (35) each containing a piston (4) supported on the ring by a roller supported at the endfaces by roller guides (53). At least one of the two roller guides is connected directly to the cylinder block, without auxiliary parts, so that it cannot rotate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03C 1/047 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/0439 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0005502A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19832696 A1 20000127; EP 1099055 A1 20010516; EP 1099055 B1 20030625; JP 2002521606 A 20020716; US 6443047 B1 20020903; WO 0005502 A1 20000203

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090709

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090709

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906111 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH AG

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020415

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010109

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE