Global Patent Index - EP 1099086 A1

EP 1099086 A1 2001-05-16 - DEVICE FOR LOADING PARTS TO BE HEAT TREATED

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR LOADING PARTS TO BE HEAT TREATED

Title (de)

ANORDUNG ZUR LADUNG VON ZU WÄRMEBEHANDELNDEN WERKSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT DE PIECES A TRAITER THERMIQUEMENT

Publication

EP 1099086 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00925390 A

Priority

  • FR 0001206 W
  • FR 9905692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2793311A1] The invention concerns a loading device made essentially of a thermostructural composite material and comprising a base (12), an internal partition (14) raised above the base, and a plurality of support arms (20) fixed to the internal partition and extending substantially horizontally therefrom up to their free ends, such that the parts to be treated (A) can be supported cantilevered by said arms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27D 5/00; C21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/20 (2006.01); C21D 1/00 (2006.01); F27D 3/12 (2006.01); F27D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 5/005 (2013.01); F27D 3/12 (2013.01); F27D 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0068626A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2793311 A1 20001110; FR 2793311 B1 20010727; AT 275718 T 20040915; CA 2337145 A1 20001116; CA 2337145 C 20060711; DE 60013535 D1 20041014; DE 60013535 T2 20051117; EP 1099086 A1 20010516; EP 1099086 B1 20040908; ES 2226824 T3 20050401; JP 2002544464 A 20021224; JP 4610089 B2 20110112; RU 2226250 C2 20040327; US 6401941 B1 20020611; WO 0068626 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170608

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: HERAKLES

- Effective date: 20140530

2013-12-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEXVALL 8, VELIZY-VILLACOUBLAY, FR

- Document: DE 60013535

- Effective date: 20131016

2013-12-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SNECMA MOTEURS, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60013535

- Effective date: 20131016

2013-12-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEXVALL, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60013535

- Effective date: 20131016

2013-12-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SNECMA PROPULSION SOLIDE, LE HAILLAN CEDEX, FR

- Document: DE 60013535

- Effective date: 20131016

2013-12-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION (S.N.E.C.M.A.), PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60013535

- Effective date: 20131016

2013-12-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60013535

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20131016

2013-06-14 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20130513

2013-06-14 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Effective date: 20130513

2013-06-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: HERAKLES, FR

- Effective date: 20130513

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226824 T3

2005-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050120

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60013535 P 20041014

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010508

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE