Global Patent Index - EP 1099142 A1

EP 1099142 A1 2001-05-16 - BRACELET CLASP

Title (en)

BRACELET CLASP

Title (de)

ARMBANDVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

FERMOIR POUR BRACELET

Publication

EP 1099142 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00919106 A

Priority

  • EP 00919106 A
  • EP 99110026 A
  • IB 0000586 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0072094A1] The invention concerns a clasp for bracelet comprising a body (2) whereof one of the sides is fixed to or integral with one of the ends (1a) of the bracelet (1) and whereof the opposite side comprises a retaining element (8) co-operating with a coupling member (7) comprised by the other end (1b) of the bracelet (1). A cover (3) is articulated on the clasp body (2) so that it can move relative to the clasp body (2) transversely with respect thereto and to the axis of the bracelet (1) and pivot about a hinge pin parallel to said axis of the bracelet (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 37/14; A44C 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/14 (2006.01); A44C 5/20 (2006.01); G04B 37/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/1486 (2013.01); A44C 5/14 (2013.01); A44C 5/2052 (2013.01); A44C 5/2071 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2166 (2013.01); Y10T 24/3413 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4745 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4782 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0072094A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0072094 A1 20001130; CN 1185559 C 20050119; CN 1304498 A 20010718; EP 1099142 A1 20010516; HK 1039180 A1 20050805; JP 2003500139 A 20030107; JP 3657882 B2 20050608; US 6457215 B1 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080223

2007-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071012

2007-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARTIER CREATION STUDIO S.A.

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH FR IT LI

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001216

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI