Global Patent Index - EP 1099152 A1

EP 1099152 A1 2001-05-16 - MARKUP LANGUAGE FOR INTERACTIVE SERVICES AND METHODS THEREOF

Title (en)

MARKUP LANGUAGE FOR INTERACTIVE SERVICES AND METHODS THEREOF

Title (de)

MARKIERUNGSSPRACHE FÜR INTERAKTIVE DIENSTE SOWIE VERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

LANGAGE DE BALISAGE POUR SERVICES INTERACTIFS ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1099152 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99934183 A

Priority

  • US 9916777 W
  • US 9413198 P
  • US 9403298 P
  • US 16546998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005643A1] The present invention (Fig. 6) relates to a voice browser to provide interactive services. A markup language document in accordance with the present invention includes a dialog element (2) including a plurality of markup language elements (3-26). Each of the plurality of markup language elements is identifiable by at least one markup tag. A step element (11) is contained within the dialog element. The step element includes a prompt element (4) and an input element (9). The prompt element (4) includes an announcement to be read to the user. The input element includes at least one input that corresponds to a user input. A method in accordance with the present invention includes the steps of creating a markup language document having a plurality of elements (3-26), selecting a prompt element (2), and defining a voice communication (14) in the prompt element to be read to the user. The method further includes the steps of selecting an input element (2) and defining an input variable to store data inputted by the user.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 3/436 (2006.01); H04M 3/493 (2006.01); H04M 7/00 (2006.01); H04M 3/38 (2006.01); H04M 3/44 (2006.01); H04M 3/46 (2006.01); H04M 3/53 (2006.01); H04M 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/4938 (2013.01); H04M 3/42204 (2013.01); H04M 3/436 (2013.01); H04M 3/382 (2013.01); H04M 3/42229 (2013.01); H04M 3/44 (2013.01); H04M 3/46 (2013.01); H04M 3/5307 (2013.01); H04M 2201/60 (2013.01); H04M 2207/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005643 A1 20000203; AU 5006799 A 20000214; CN 1354851 A 20020619; EP 1099152 A1 20010516; EP 1099152 A4 20040519

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061215

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040824

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040824

2004-05-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040402

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE