Global Patent Index - EP 1099210 A1

EP 1099210 A1 2001-05-16 - A HIGH DEFINITION VOLUMETRIC DISPLAY SYSTEM

Title (en)

A HIGH DEFINITION VOLUMETRIC DISPLAY SYSTEM

Title (de)

HOCHAUFLÖSUNGS-VOLUMETRISCHES ANZEIGESYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE VOLUMETRIQUE HAUTE DEFINITION

Publication

EP 1099210 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99928245 A

Priority

  • NZ 9900072 W
  • NZ 33058898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963512A1] A three-dimensional display system is described. An arrangement of optical emitters within the display is arranged so that they provide an isotropically distributed array of light emitting sources within the display volume. The display incorporates a solid optically transparent support structure which contains the optical sources and is rotated to provide an appropriately shaped display volume. The optical sources may be illuminated within the display volume in such a manner that a three-dimensional image is generated inside the display volume. In one embodiment, the optical sources are laid out on planes perpendicular to the axis of rotation of a support structure whereby for any single plane, the optical sources are located relative to one another on corresponding tracks so that the optical sources form a spiral when viewed along the axis of rotation. The planes may be arranged on top of one another and sequentially displaced around the axis of rotation so that the optical sources lie on the surface of a helix. The optical sources may be light emitting diodes or similar optoelectronic devices. The optical sources may be driven by means of parallel data which is multiplexed where the degree of serial/parallel mixing is controllable and dependent upon matching the display to the control electronics. Suitable applications include medical and similar imaging, traffic control and other applications where a three-dimensional representation of a particular image may be required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 27/22 (2006.01); G09F 9/33 (2006.01); G09G 3/00 (2006.01); H04N 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/005 (2013.01); G02B 27/2285 (2013.01); G09F 9/33 (2013.01); G09G 3/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963512 A1 19991209; AU 4534799 A 19991220; AU 751802 B2 20020829; CA 2350687 A1 19991209; CN 1310836 A 20010829; EP 1099210 A1 20010516; EP 1099210 A4 20020227; IL 140035 D0 20020210; JP 2002517789 A 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-02-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09G 3/14 A, 7G 09G 3/00 B

2001-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WOOD, RICHARD, JEFFREY, HARGEFT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE