Global Patent Index - EP 1099211 A1

EP 1099211 A1 2001-05-16 - SUBFRAME-CONTROLLED IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (en)

SUBFRAME-CONTROLLED IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (de)

UNTERRAHMENGESTEUERTE BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE A COMMANDE PAR SOUS-TRAME

Publication

EP 1099211 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932805 A

Priority

  • DE 19833597 A
  • DE 19837307 A
  • EP 9904632 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0007173A1] The invention relates to a pulsewidth-modulated image display device, notably a plasma display, comprising control means for controlling a screen. The time interval available for displaying an image is divided into several chronologically sequential partial time intervals. The picture elements of the image display device are divided into two partial time groups. The brightness signal assigned to a picture element is generated from a RGB signal via an activation scheme and an activation sequence derived therefrom. The image display device comprises a motion sensor, as well as means for modifying the sequence of the partial time intervals and/or means for modifying the activation sequence. The sequence of the partial time intervals and/or the activation sequence are modified in accordance with the output signal of the motion sensor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2022 (2013.01); G09G 3/2803 (2013.01); G09G 3/2018 (2013.01); G09G 3/204 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0247 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0261 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0266 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007173A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0007173 A1 20000210; EP 1099211 A1 20010516; EP 1099211 B1 20041103; ES 2232148 T3 20050516

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-09-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232148 T3

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911003 P 20041209

2004-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-11-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG MULTIMEDIA B.V.

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE