Global Patent Index - EP 1099253 A1

EP 1099253 A1 2001-05-16 - PBGA PACKAGE WITH INTEGRATED BALL GRID

Title (en)

PBGA PACKAGE WITH INTEGRATED BALL GRID

Title (de)

PBGA-GEHÄUSE MIT INTEGRIERTEM KUGELRASTERRAHMEN

Title (fr)

BOITIER PBGA A GRILLE DE BILLAGE INTEGREE

Publication

EP 1099253 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00925385 A

Priority

  • FR 0001201 W
  • FR 9905930 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0068991A1] The invention concerns an integrated circuit package (5) comprising a cavity (2) wherein the integrated circuit (5) is fixed, the active surface (10) of the integrated circuit (3) being electrically connected to the package at the connection level (Nc) of a ball array (13i) on the package providing a mechanical and electrical link between the integrated circuit (5) and a printed circuit card whereon the package is to be assembled. The invention is characterised in that it comprises a rigid and electrically neutral additional layer (14) directly mounted on the connection level (Nc) of the integrated circuit (5) and the balls (13i), and contains the balls (13i). The invention is useful in particular for connections of BGA and PBGA packages.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 23/31; H01L 23/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/12 (2006.01); H01L 23/24 (2006.01); H01L 23/498 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/49816 (2013.01); H01L 23/24 (2013.01); H01L 24/45 (2013.01); H01L 24/48 (2013.01); H01L 2224/45124 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48091 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48472 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01012 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01079 (2013.01); H01L 2924/14 (2013.01); H01L 2924/15153 (2013.01); H01L 2924/15165 (2013.01); H01L 2924/15311 (2013.01); H01L 2924/1532 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2224/48091 + H01L 2924/00014
  2. H01L 2224/48472 + H01L 2224/48091 + H01L 2924/00
  3. H01L 2224/45124 + H01L 2924/00014
  4. H01L 2924/14 + H01L 2924/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0068991A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2793606 A1 20001117; FR 2793606 B1 20030613; EP 1099253 A1 20010516; JP 2002544670 A 20021224; JP 3520049 B2 20040419; WO 0068991 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080802

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050629

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE