Global Patent Index - EP 1099278 A1

EP 1099278 A1 2001-05-16 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR WITH QUICK CONNECTION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONNECTOR

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR WITH QUICK CONNECTION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONNECTOR

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER MIT SCHNELLVERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES STECKVERBINDERS

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE A CONNEXION RAPIDE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1099278 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923372 A

Priority

  • DE 9900705 W
  • DE 19832971 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005785A1] The invention relates to an electrical connector with quick-acting lock, having a first connecting element (1), a second connecting element (2), a locking ring (3) and an unlocking sleeve (7). The first connecting element (1) is fitted with an outer peripheral groove (5). The locking ring (3) is fixed to the second connecting element (2) by means of an inner peripheral groove (6). Locking tabs (4) radially oriented inwards and inclined in the direction of insertion (X) of the first connecting element (1) are also formed on the locking ring (3). Said locking tabs (4) elastically penetrate the groove (5) on the first connecting element when the connector is locked. The unlocking sleeve (7) can be displaced axially on the second connecting element (2). Said unlocking sleeve (7) has a cylindrical unlocking organ (8) projecting in the direction of insertion (X) of the first connecting element (1). The free ends of the locking tabs (4) may be pressed outwards by means of the unlocking organ (8). The locking ring (3) is disc-shaped and has a substantially small closed form.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6277 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0005785A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005785 A1 20000203; AT 225573 T 20021015; CA 2337775 A1 20000203; EP 1099278 A1 20010516; EP 1099278 B1 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180314

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS A.G.

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030128

2003-01-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2003-01-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902964 20021107

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225573 T 20021015

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010104

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE