Global Patent Index - EP 1099311 A1

EP 1099311 A1 2001-05-16 - DELAY COMPENSATION FOR ANALOG-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTER IN SIGMA-DELTA MODULATORS

Title (en)

DELAY COMPENSATION FOR ANALOG-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTER IN SIGMA-DELTA MODULATORS

Title (de)

VERZÖGERUNGSKOMPENSATION DES A/D WANDLERS IN SIGMA-DELTA MODULATOREN

Title (fr)

COMPENSATION DU RETARD DU CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE-NUMERIQUE DANS LES MODULATEURS SIGMA-DELTA

Publication

EP 1099311 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99950814 A

Priority

  • FR 9902579 W
  • FR 9813324 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2785109A1] The sigma-delta modulator comprises an amplifying unit (10), a subtractor (20), a sample-and-hold device (30), an analog-to-digital converter (40), and a decoupling filter (50) in the direct chain. A compensating filter (70) is connected between the input of analog-to-digital converter (40) and the inverting input of the subtractor (20). A digital-to-analog converter (60) is connected to the inverting input of the amplifying unit (10). The amplifying unit (10) comprises an amplification stage with gain (G) greater than unity, preferably greater than hundred. The pulse response (RI) at the subtractor output comprises a first part covering the interval (0,T), where T is greater than the propagation delay, and a second part covering the interval T to infinity. The compensating filter (70) contributes to the first part, and the amplifying unit (10) contributes to the second part only. The compensating filter contributes to the second part of the pulse response (RI) in a manner as having a gain (K) so that the compensation in the useful frequency zone is at minimum. The sample-and-hold device (30) is controlled by the sampling frequency. The compensating filter (70) contains four sample-and-hold devices connected in series, branches with resistors, and an inverter in one branch. The instants of sampling are selected so that the compensating filter contributes to the first part of the pulse response with avoiding voltage surges at the input of the sample-and-hold device. The amplifying unit (10) also contains an integration stage, and a filter so that the gain is a function of frequency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03M 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03M 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03M 3/37 (2013.01); H03M 3/458 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0025428A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2785109 A1 20000428; FR 2785109 B1 20010119; CA 2347164 A1 20000504; DE 69901037 D1 20020418; DE 69901037 T2 20021121; EP 1099311 A1 20010516; EP 1099311 B1 20020313; JP 2002528989 A 20020903; US 6388601 B1 20020514; WO 0025428 A1 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131022

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69901037

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131022

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131022

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121013

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121018

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101023

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110501

2011-05-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110501

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091004

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091007

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-10-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901037 20020418

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE