Global Patent Index - EP 1099389 A1

EP 1099389 A1 2001-05-16 - Protective helmet

Title (en)

Protective helmet

Title (de)

Schutzhelm

Title (fr)

Casque protecteur

Publication

EP 1099389 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00123602 A

Priority

FR 9914684 A

Abstract (en)

The protective helmet has a shell (2), a protective lining, and a retaining strap (4). The shell has an over-strain gauge (5) which changes state when the helmet is subjected to a shock above a set value. The detector has a capillary tube closed at its ends and filled with liquid between two gas bubbles.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un casque protecteur qui comprend une calotte (2), un rembourrage protecteur, éventuellement un rembourrage de confort et un système de rétention (4). Selon l'invention, la calotte présente un détecteur visuel de choc (5) qui change d'état lorsque la calotte est soumise à un choc dépassant un seuil prédéterminé. Par exemple, le détecteur est formé par un tube capillaire bouché à ses deux extrémités renfermant une goutte de liquide coloré emprisonnée entre deux bulles de gaz. Application à tout type de casque, pour la pratique d'un sport, pour la moto, pour un usage professionnel, casque de chantier ... <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/067 (2013.01); A42B 3/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099389 A1 20010516; FR 2800580 A1 20010511; FR 2800580 B1 20011214; US 6301718 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030620

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI