Global Patent Index - EP 1099394 A1

EP 1099394 A1 2001-05-16 - Application assembly comprising an applicator for a liquid, pasty or powdery product, comprising bristles incorporating particles

Title (en)

Application assembly comprising an applicator for a liquid, pasty or powdery product, comprising bristles incorporating particles

Title (de)

Auftragungseinheit mit einem partikeldurchsetzten Borsten enthaltenden Applikator für ein flüssiges, pastenartiges oder pulverförmiges Produkt

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'application comportant un applicateur pour un produit liquide, pâteaux ou pulvérulent comprenant des poils chargés de particules

Publication

EP 1099394 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402959 A

Priority

FR 9914149 A

Abstract (en)

The container (2) is equipped with an applicator (4) with a holder (3) forming the container cap and a stem (5) tipped with bristles (9). The bristles, which are preferably 0.06 - 0.20 mm in diameter, and can have a wide variety of grooved cross-sections, from cruciform to polygonal to shapes of letters of the alphabet, are made from a polymer or elastomer matrix containing particles giving random surface projections. The particles can be of mica, calcium carbonate, ZnO, TiO2, MgO. Al2O3, cotton, cellulose, silica, silicates, talc, clay, urea/formaldehyde, wood powder, graphite or metals which are cosmetically compatible, and are preferably in a proportion pof 2.5 - 6 per cent of the total volume of the bristles.

Abstract (fr)

Ensemble d'application (1) comportant un réservoir (2) contenant un produit cosmétique (M) et un applicateur (6), ledit applicateur comprenant : un élément de préhension (3) formant un moyen d'ouverture/fermeture du réservoir, et solidaire d'un organe d'application (4) qui, en position fermée de l'ensemble, est disposé à l'intérieur du réservoir, ledit organe d'application comprenant un arrangement de poils (9) dont au moins une partie contient des particules (P) formant des aspérités (B) faisant saillie, de manière aléatoire, sur tout ou partie de la surface desdits poils. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 1/00; A45D 34/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 29/00 (2006.01); A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A46D 1/00 (2006.01); A46D 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/0261 (2013.01); A45D 34/046 (2013.01); A46D 1/00 (2013.01); A46D 9/06 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1053 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099394 A1 20010516; EP 1099394 B1 20070627; AR 026402 A1 20030212; AT 365485 T 20070715; BR 0005581 A 20010612; BR 0005581 B1 20090113; CA 2325727 A1 20010510; CA 2325727 C 20050215; CN 100537366 C 20090909; CN 1300701 A 20010627; DE 60035325 D1 20070809; DE 60035325 T2 20080306; ES 2288149 T3 20080101; FR 2800586 A1 20010511; FR 2800586 B1 20011207; JP 2001178534 A 20010703; JP 3577664 B2 20041013; MX PA00010778 A 20030606; US 6623200 B1 20030923

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171102

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171018

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071025

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070627

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070627

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2008-05-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: L'OREAL

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070627

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070928

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070627

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070627

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071127

2008-01-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2288149 T3

2007-12-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070627

2007-10-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070912

2007-09-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070927

2007-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60035325 P 20070809

2007-08-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2007-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-06-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040503

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI