Global Patent Index - EP 1099398 A1

EP 1099398 A1 2001-05-16 - Display with shelves

Title (en)

Display with shelves

Title (de)

Schaugestell mit Regalen

Title (fr)

Présentoir avec étagères

Publication

EP 1099398 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203886 A

Priority

BE 9900733 A

Abstract (en)

Shelf display, which substantially is composed of plate-shaped display material, characterized in that it at least consists of two side panels (2) and at least one shelf (4) provided in between, which shelf consists at least of two parts (6-7) which can be folded in respect to each other in such a manner that at least the whole unit formed by the aforementioned side panels (2) and the shelf (4), shelves (4), respectively, can be unfolded, collapsed, respectively. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/11; A47B 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 43/02 (2006.01); A47F 5/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 43/02 (2013.01); A47F 5/116 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099398 A1 20010516; BE 1013131 A3 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031018

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030606

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI