Global Patent Index - EP 1099404 A1

EP 1099404 A1 2001-05-16 - Basket with cutlery holder for domestic dishwasher

Title (en)

Basket with cutlery holder for domestic dishwasher

Title (de)

Besteckhalter zum gebrauch im Geschirrkorb einer Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Porte-couvert destiné au panier à vaisselle pour lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 1099404 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203734 A

Priority

IT MI990682 U

Abstract (en)

A basket (12) for home dishwasher is described comprising at least one side wall (11) and at least one plastic shelf (3) connected with said at least one side wall (11) in order to form an angle smaller than a right angle with the bottom plane (21) of said basket (12). The shelf (3) is made integral with at least one cutlery holder (1) comprising holes (2) for the housing of cutlery and wide areas (30) for the flow of the washing water and/or the flow of drying air <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/503 (2013.01); A47L 15/502 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099404 A1 20010516; EP 1099404 B1 20100407; DE 60044115 D1 20100520; IT 247127 Y1 20020502; IT MI990682 U1 20010511; IT MI990682 V0 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171005

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110110

2010-05-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60044115 P 20100520

2010-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-11-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BASKET WITH CUTLERY HOLDER FOR DOMESTIC DISHWASHER

2007-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070312

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011103

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI