Global Patent Index - EP 1099436 A2

EP 1099436 A2 2001-05-16 - Operating table system

Title (en)

Operating table system

Title (de)

Operationstischsystem

Title (fr)

Système de table d'opération

Publication

EP 1099436 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124551 A

Priority

DE 19953858 A

Abstract (en)

The operating table for use in veterinary medicine has a steel working surface (1) whose outer edge (15) acts as a support rail. Mounting blocks (4) carry bars to which infusion bottles, instruments, etc. may be attached. The mounting blocks correspond in shape to the rail and can be fastened to it by screw handles (9).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein insbesondere für veterinärmedizinische Zwecke bestimmtes Operationstischsystem beschrieben, bei dem der Umfangsrandbereich der Tischplatte als verstärkte Versorgungsschiene ausgebildet und mit Halteblöcken form- und kraftschlüssig kuppelbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 13/101 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19953858 A1 20010510; EP 1099436 A2 20010516; EP 1099436 A3 20021016

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-08-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI