Global Patent Index - EP 1099459 A1

EP 1099459 A1 2001-05-16 - Mechanical golf counter

Title (en)

Mechanical golf counter

Title (de)

Mechanischer Golf Zähler

Title (fr)

Compteur de golf mécanique

Publication

EP 1099459 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99121783 A

Priority

EP 99121783 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanical golf counter for a watch has a first catch (30) Actuated by a pusher (P1) with a nose (33) at one end co-operating with a star wheel (17) carrying the counter for the number of swings per hole. The star wheel is controlled by a jumper (21) and a coil spring (20). A second catch (24) has a return spring (27) and is connected to a second pusher (P2). The second pusher co-operates with a second star wheel (13) carrying a second counter (6,7). The second arm of the pusher co-operates with a jumper to release the first star wheel.

Abstract (fr)

Le compteur de golf comprend un mécanisme entièrement mécanique qui comporte une première bascule (30) actionnée par un premier poussoir (P1) muni à son extrémité d'un bec (33) coopérant avec une première étoile (17) portant l'organe mobile (9) du compteur du nombre de coups par trou (8,9) et soumise à l'action d'un sautoir (21) et d'un ressort spiral (20). Ce mécanisme comporte une seconde bascule (24) dont le premier bras est soumis à l'action d'un ressort de rappel (27) et relié opérationnellement à un second poussoir (P2), ce premier bras présentant un bec (26) coopérant avec la denture d'une seconde étoile (13) portant l'organe mobile (7) du compteur du numéro de trou 6,7. Le second bras (28) de cette seconde bascule (24) actionne lors de son pivotement sous l'action du second poussoir (P2) le sautoir (21) libérant ainsi la première étoile (17) provoquant sa remise à zéro par le ressort spiral (20). Lors de la course de retour en position de repos du second poussoir (P2) le bec (26) du premier bras de la seconde bascule (24) provoque l'incrémentation de la seconde étoile (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 71/06; G06M 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/06 (2006.01); G06M 1/00 (2006.01); G06M 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/0672 (2013.01); G04B 47/06 (2013.01); G06M 1/00 (2013.01); G06M 1/045 (2013.01); G06M 1/146 (2013.01); G06M 1/38 (2013.01); A63B 2102/32 (2015.10)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099459 A1 20010516; EP 1099459 B1 20041215; AT 284739 T 20050115; DE 69922659 D1 20050120; DE 69922659 T2 20051222; DK 1099459 T3 20050425; ES 2235420 T3 20050701; HK 1033285 A1 20050513; JP 2001161882 A 20010619; PT 1099459 E 20050429; US 6543681 B1 20030408

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69922659

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69922659

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061103

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061104

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RJ WATCHES S.A.

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061103

2007-08-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-07-02 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-05-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070503

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061104

2006-11-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-11-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-11-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061103

2005-12-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-11-25 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-22 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-15 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-14 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: RJ WATCHES SA

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235420 T3

2005-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: RJ WATCHES SA

2005-05-13 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033285

2005-04-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: RJ WATCHES SA CH

- Effective date: 20050309

2005-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-04-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RJ WATCHES SA

2005-04-27 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: WIEDERRECHT, JEAN-MARC

2005-04-27 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: FREIRE, CARLOS

2005-04-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-04-20 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400879

2005-04-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922659 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *RJ WATCHES S.A.RUE DU MARCHé 9, CH-1240 GENèVE

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *RJ WATCHES S.A.

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI