Global Patent Index - EP 1099460 A2

EP 1099460 A2 2001-05-16 - A method of assembling a rotatable bayonet joint and such joint

Title (en)

A method of assembling a rotatable bayonet joint and such joint

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Zusammensetzung einer drehbaren Bajonettverbindung sowie eine solche Verbindung

Title (fr)

Méthode pour assembler un joint à baillonnette ainsi qu'un tel joint

Publication

EP 1099460 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00610114 A

Priority

DK PA199901621 A

Abstract (en)

A method is provided for the assembly of a first and a second element that are, following assembly, rotatable relative to each other. The first element is provided with a mounting aperture (4) with bayonet protrusions (5), and the second element is provided with a mounting pin (7) with bayonet protrusions (8) that are complementary with the bayonet protrusions (5) in the mounting aperture (4). Following assembly of the first and the second element a third element is mounted on the first or the second element, which third element allows rotation between the first and the second elements, but prevents the first and the second elements from being, at a later stage, rotated to the mounting position. Such rotatable joint between a first and a second element is also provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 3/46; A63H 33/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/46 (2006.01); A63H 33/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/46 (2013.01); A63H 33/067 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 417112 A 19101107 - ALBERT DAY [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099460 A2 20010516; EP 1099460 A3 20030312; CA 2325313 A1 20010510; CN 1173759 C 20041103; CN 1295874 A 20010523; DK 199901621 A 20010511

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060307

2004-01-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2003-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030829

2003-05-28 [16A] NEW DOCUMENTS DISCOVERED AFTER COMPLETION OF THE EP-SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI