Global Patent Index - EP 1099461 A1

EP 1099461 A1 2001-05-16 - Pole support for obstacles for show jumps

Title (en)

Pole support for obstacles for show jumps

Title (de)

Stangenauflage für Springreithindernisse

Title (fr)

Support de barres pour obstacles de sauts hippiques

Publication

EP 1099461 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122551 A

Priority

EP 99122551 A

Abstract (en)

The bar-support consists of a stable especially plastic molded body (10) which has several concave bearing-points (32,34) for the ends of the obstacle-bars (36). The bearing pints are on protuberances (30) protruding from at least one side surface (12,28) of the molded body and running at right angles to the obstacle-bars. All the edges of the blow-molded body are rounded. The molded body has two sides (14,16)at right angles to each other and one convex side (18), seen at right angles from the side surfaces.

Abstract (de)

Stangenauflage für Springreithindernisse, mit einem standfesten Formkörper (10), insbesondere aus Kunststoff, der mehrere konkave Lagerstellen (32, 34) für die Enden der Hindernisstangen (36) aufweist, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Lagerstellen (32, 34) an Vorsprüngen (30) ausgebildet sind, die von mindestens einer rechtwinklig zu den Hindernisstangen (36) verlaufenden Seitenflächen (12, 28) des Formkörpers (10) vorspringen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63K 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63K 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63K 3/046 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099461 A1 20010516; EP 1099461 B1 20040908; AT 275432 T 20040915; DE 59910465 D1 20041014

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061112

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061112

2006-11-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061112

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-01-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-12-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910465 P 20041014

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000506

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI