Global Patent Index - EP 1099481 A1

EP 1099481 A1 2001-05-16 - Comminuting machine

Title (en)

Comminuting machine

Title (de)

Zerkleinerungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine de broyage

Publication

EP 1099481 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124420 A

Priority

DE 29919968 U

Abstract (en)

The machine comprises a cutter shaft (9) which carries several cutter blades (5) and which is held rotatably in a support frame (2). The cutter blades operate in conjunction with an additional tool in order to pulverize incoming material. The frame consists of two opposite side sections (3,4) and two end sections (5,6) which hold the shaft. Both end sections have a part which can be removed in order to remove the drive shaft.

Abstract (de)

Eine Zerkleinerungsmaschine mit zumindest einer in einem ausgesteiften Schneidwerksrahmen gelagerten, eine Vielzahl von Schneidscheiben tragenden, motorisch angetriebenen Schneidwelle 9, deren Schneidscheiben zum Zerkleinern eines Gutes mit einem weiteren Werkzeug 10 zusammenwirken, wobei der Schneidwerksrahmen im wesentlichen aus zwei gegenüberliegenden, sich parallel zur Schneidwelle 9 erstreckenden Seitenteilen und zwei, die Seitenteile miteinander verbindenden Stirnteilen 6 besteht, ist dadurch bestimmt, daß die Stirnteile 6 geteilt ausgebildet sind und aus einem oberen Stirnteilelement 8 und einem unteren Stirnteilelement 7 bestehen, die Lager der zumindest einen Schneidwelle 9 durch die Stirnteile 6 gehalten sind, wobei jeweils ein Lager durch die beiden Stirnteilelemente 7, 8 eines Stirnteils 6 eingefaßt ist, und das obere Stirnteilelement 8 jeder Stirnseite 6 an den Stirnseiten der angrenzenden Seitenteile durch stirnseitig bezüglich der angrenzenden Seitenteile angreifende Befestigungsmittel Bs lösbar befestigt ist, so daß zum Herausnehmen der zumindest einen Schneidwelle 9 aus dem Schneidwerksrahmen die oberen Stirnteilelemente 8 ohne eine Dejustage des Schneidwerksrahmens von dem Schneidwerksrahmen demontierbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/16; B02C 18/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/14 (2006.01); B02C 18/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/142 (2013.01); B02C 18/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0667187 A1 19950816 - PRECIMECA SOCIETE ANONYME [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 29919968 U1 20000203; AT 249280 T 20030915; DK 1099481 T3 20040126; EP 1099481 A1 20010516; EP 1099481 B1 20030910; ES 2200773 T3 20040316; US 6772971 B1 20040810

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111109

2013-07-02 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111108

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 249280 T

- Effective date: 20111108

2012-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111109

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111108

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50003623

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111108

2012-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111108

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20120614

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111108

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-06-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-06-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SYNMET HOLDING B.V.

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20101129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2006-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060429

2006-10-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: SYNMET HOLDING B.V.; NL

- Effective date: 20060821

2006-09-06 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060429

2006-08-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: SYNMET HOLDING B.V.; NL

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-04-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2006-03-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SYNMET HOLDING B.V.

- Effective date: 20051222

2006-01-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-11-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SYNMET HOLDING B.V.

- Free text: BECKER, UDO#LUDWIG RICHTER STRASSE 33#58706 MENDEN (DE) $ PLAHUTA, IGOR#RITTERHAUSSTRASSE 74#58708 MENDEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SYNMET HOLDING B.V.#BINNENHAVEN 43#7547 BG ENSCHEDE (NL)

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH

2004-08-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH

- Effective date: 20040611

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200773 T3

2004-01-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-01-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-12-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031108

2003-11-08 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031108

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003623 P 20031016

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-09-10 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BECKER, UDO

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLAHUTA, IGOR

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECKER, UDO

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PLAHUTA, IGOR

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20011108

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI