Global Patent Index - EP 1099496 A1

EP 1099496 A1 2001-05-16 - Device for reducing heat dissipation of a continuous casting mould

Title (en)

Device for reducing heat dissipation of a continuous casting mould

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verminderung der Wärmeabfuhr einer Stranggusskokille

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la réduction de dissipation de chaleur dans une lingotière de coulée continue

Publication

EP 1099496 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00123100 A

Priority

DE 19953905 A

Abstract (en)

Process for preventing the removal of heat from a continuous casting mold comprises throttling the heat stream between the casting shell and the inner surface of the mold using a higher heat transition resistance between the two parts. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for preventing the removal of heat from a continuous casting mold. Preferred Features: The inner surface of the mold is provided with an anti-wear layer before or after macroscopic treatment.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Verminderung der Wärmeabfuhr einer Stranggusskokille, insbesondere in deren Badspiegelbereich. Um die Rissgefahr in der Strangschale zu vermindern, wird der Wärmestrom zwischen der sich bildenden Gussschale und der Kokilleninnenfläche durch einen höheren Wärmedurchgangswiderstand zwischen diesen Teilen gedrosselt, wobei der höhere Wärmedurchgangswiderstand zwischen der sich bildenden Strangschale und der Kokilleninnenfläche die Folge einer entsprechenden Makrotextur der Kokilleninnenfläche ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/059 (2006.01); B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B22D 11/16 (2006.01); B22D 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/059 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] AT 269392 B 19690310 - MANNESMANN AG [DE]
  • [A] FR 2658440 A3 19910823 - SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH [FR]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 435 (M - 1655) 15 August 1994 (1994-08-15)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 12 31 October 1998 (1998-10-31)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 159 (M - 0956) 28 March 1990 (1990-03-28)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 333 (M - 1150) 23 August 1991 (1991-08-23)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099496 A1 20010516; EP 1099496 B1 20060111; AT 315448 T 20060215; CN 1350895 A 20020529; DE 19953905 A1 20010517; DE 50012044 D1 20060406; ES 2255934 T3 20060716; JP 2001170741 A 20010626; KR 20010051510 A 20010625; TW 534842 B 20030601

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-06-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ACCIAI SPECIALI TERNI S.P.A., IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: ACCIAI SPECIALI TERNI S.P.A., TERNI, IT; SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 50012044

2015-09-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: ACCIAI SPECIALI TERNI S.P.A., TERNI, IT; SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 50012044

2015-09-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012044

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2006-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2255934 T3

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012044 P 20060406

2006-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2006-01-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-07-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR REDUCING HEAT DISSIPATION OF A CONTINUOUS CASTING MOULD

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040218

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001107

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI