Global Patent Index - EP 1099509 A1

EP 1099509 A1 2001-05-16 - Marking workpieces

Title (en)

Marking workpieces

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Markieren von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour marquer des pièces de travail

Publication

EP 1099509 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00122534 A

Priority

  • DE 19949552 A
  • DE 10049701 A

Abstract (en)

The present application is for providing a method for marking workpieces on punch presses, wherein a marking tool is forced by means of a punch stroke onto or into the surface of a sheet-shaped workpiece, which is displaceable in its plane, in which the marking tool has a tool tip (34) which, after being forced onto or into the workpiece, is maintained in a marking position, the workpiece is displaced in its plane corresponding to the contours of the symbol to be marked or inscribed, and subsequently the tool tip (34) is moved back into its position of rest wherein, if required, after an appropriate movement of the position of the workpiece, the marking process is repeated in accordance with the number of markings to be made. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23P 23/00; B44C 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 51/00 (2006.01); B21D 17/02 (2006.01); B44B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 51/005 (2013.01); B21D 17/02 (2013.01); B44B 5/0019 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0126901 A1 20010419; AU 8025900 A 20010423; EP 1099509 A1 20010516; EP 1099509 B1 20041006

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-09-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031110

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI