Global Patent Index - EP 1099516 A2

EP 1099516 A2 2001-05-16 - Screw tightening knob with preadjustable active torque

Title (en)

Screw tightening knob with preadjustable active torque

Title (de)

Knauf zum Anziehen von Schrauben mit voreinstellbarem aktiven Drehmoment

Title (fr)

Pommeau pour serrer des vis avec couple actif préréglable

Publication

EP 1099516 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123463 A

Priority

IT MO990056 U

Abstract (en)

A screw tightening knob with preadjustable active torque is composed of an adaptor base (2) which can be rigidly coupled to a body to be tightened and onto which a handgrip (4) can be screwed with interposed pre-loaded friction coupling means (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/141 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099516 A2 20010516; EP 1099516 A3 20021023; IT 248532 Y1 20030204; IT MO990056 U1 20010510; IT MO990056 V0 19991110

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-08-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI