Global Patent Index - EP 1099539 A1

EP 1099539 A1 2001-05-16 - Multi-ply/single ply embossed absorbent paper products

Title (en)

Multi-ply/single ply embossed absorbent paper products

Title (de)

Ein- oder mehrlagiges, saugfähiges geprägtes Papierprodukt

Title (fr)

Produit papetier absorbant gaufré mono- ou multi-couche

Publication

EP 1099539 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00310059 A

Priority

  • US 16527099 P
  • US 16508099 P
  • US 70913900 A
  • US 70918500 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to embossing single-ply or multi-ply paper products, for example, paper towels, tissue and napkins, in which an improved embossing arrangement is used which is particularly suitable for paper products which have been processed so as to impart undulations whose axes extend in a principal undulatory direction, typically in the machine direction. The absorbent sheet typically further includes undulations which extend in the cross (transverse direction) of the web such that the absorbent sheet has a biaxially undulatory structure. The undulations may be formed by the use of an undulatory creping blade. Defined parameters accommodate: the distance at which the undulations are spaced, the total surface area of the design (embossing) elements, the width and length of the embossing elements and the aspect ratio of the elements, as well as the angular orientation of the embossing elements with respect to the undulations. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/14; B31F 1/07; B31F 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2006.01); B31F 1/12 (2006.01); B31F 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2013.01); B31F 1/122 (2013.01); B31F 1/145 (2013.01); B31F 2201/072 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0728 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0735 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0738 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0756 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0758 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0761 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0784 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099539 A1 20010516; EP 1099539 B1 20070328; AT 358016 T 20070415; DE 60034098 D1 20070510; DE 60034098 T2 20071213; ES 2281325 T3 20071001

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-11 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20160311

2016-05-11 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20160311

2016-03-11 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60034098

2016-03-11 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 60034098

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151008

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20151009

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071113

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071113

2008-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070629

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2008-01-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB

- Effective date: 20071217

2007-10-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2281325 T3

2007-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-08-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070828

2007-07-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC CONSUMER OPERATIONS LLC

- Effective date: 20070502

2007-06-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070628

2007-05-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60034098 P 20070510

2007-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC CONSUMER OPERATIONS LLC

2007-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-03-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-03-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-03-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-03-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-03-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-03-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KERSHAW, THOMAS N.

2007-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRACYALNY, DALE T.

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050225

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI