Global Patent Index - EP 1099548 A2

EP 1099548 A2 2001-05-16 - Proof printing device for printing and/or coating web materials

Title (en)

Proof printing device for printing and/or coating web materials

Title (de)

Probedruckeinrichtung zum Bedrucken und/oder Beschichten von bahnförmigen Materialien

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression d'essais pour imprimer et/ou pour revêtir des materiaux en bande

Publication

EP 1099548 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111472 A

Priority

DE 19924614 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19924614A1] The test pressure unit has at least one deflection roller (1.9) with variable position and counter pressure rollers. Counter pressure rollers (1.6) and deflection rollers are arranged so that the sheet to be printed is temporarily fixed on a pressure band running about the counter pressure roller, so that the sheet forms a transport band (1.13). The surface of the counter pressure roller is chosen for the corresponding printing method, i.e. it is compressible for gravure printing and incompressible for flexographic printing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Probedruckeinrichtung zum Bedrucken und/oder Beschichten von bahnförmigen Materialien im Tiefdruckverfahren, im Flexodruckverfahren mit Schöpfzylinder und Klischeewalze als Farbübertragungswalze oder indirekten Tiefdruckverfahren und Rakelmesser zur Dosierung der Druckfarbe. Bei hoher Druckgeschwindigkeit kommt eine in ihrer Position variable Gegendruckwalze oder Walzenpaar mit Transportband zum Bedrucken des Druckbogens oder mit einem als Transportband endlos gemachten Druckbogen während maximal einer Umdrehung mit der farbführenden Druckwalze (Tiefdruckwalze) bzw. Farbschöpfwalze und Klischeewalze beim Flexodruck oder glatter Walze beim indirekten Tiefdruck mit dem bogenförmigen Bedruckstoff in Kontakt und nimmt eine einmalige Bedruckung vor, wobei die Tiefdruckwalze beim Tiefdruckverfahren bzw. die Flexodruckwalze zusammen mit der Farbschöpfwalze in ihren Umfängen so gestaltet sind und über einen gemeinsamen mechanischen Zwangsantrieb oder mit zwei elektronisch zwangsgekoppelten Antrieben verbunden sind, daß nach ein- oder ganzzahlig mehrfacher Umdrehung der Tiefdruck- bzw. Flexodruckwalze diese die Gegendruckwalze an der gleichen Stelle wieder berühren kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 5/20 (2006.01); B41F 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 5/20 (2013.01); B41F 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19924614 A1 20001130; EP 1099548 A2 20010516; EP 1099548 A3 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-09-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 5/20 A, 7B 41F 9/04 B

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI