Global Patent Index - EP 1099550 A2

EP 1099550 A2 2001-05-16 - Silk-screen printing machine for the printing of cylindrical objects

Title (en)

Silk-screen printing machine for the printing of cylindrical objects

Title (de)

Siebdruckmaschine zum Bedrucken von zylindrischen Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression sérigraphique pour imprimer sur des objets cylindriques

Publication

EP 1099550 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203684 A

Priority

IT MI992283 A

Abstract (en)

Rotary machine for the silk-screen printing of substantially cylindrical objects (1), comprising a vertical axis of rotation (20), at least one arm (12) supporting at least one printing frame (210,211) and at least one doctor blade (230), means (50,51) for supporting the object (1), rotatable about their longitudinal axis, means (40,41) for rotational actuation, about the vertical axis (20), of the said means (50) for supporting the container (1), in which said support arm (12) is movable translationwise, parallel to the vertical axis of rotation (20), towards/away from the object (1) to be printed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/36 (2006.01); B41F 15/08 (2006.01); B41F 15/30 (2006.01); B41F 15/44 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/0872 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099550 A2 20010516; EP 1099550 A3 20010912; IT 1313835 B1 20020923; IT MI992283 A1 20010502; IT MI992283 D0 19991102; JP 2001129963 A 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI