Global Patent Index - EP 1099553 A2

EP 1099553 A2 2001-05-16 - Device and method for avoiding winders in a rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Device and method for avoiding winders in a rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Verhindern von Wicklern in einer Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour éviter des enroulements dans une machine d'impression rotative

Publication

EP 1099553 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122294 A

Priority

US 43680999 A

Abstract (en)

The winder impeding device has a sensor to detect a tear in the web in the press and a doctor knife (52) which is controlled by the sensor. In normal operation, the doctor knife is away from the cylinder (22). If there is a tear, it is moved against the cylinder. The doctor knife may have a piston (100) controlled by the sensor.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Verhindern von Wicklern (50, 150, 250, 350) in einer einen Zylinder (22) mit einer Mantelfläche aufweisenden Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine, welche sich durch einen Sensor (120, 121, 122, 123, 124) zum Erfassen eines Bahnrisses in der Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine und ein Rakelmesser (52) auszeichnet, das von dem Sensor (120, 121, 122, 123, 124) gesteuert wird, wobei das Rakelmesser (52) im Normalbetrieb eine erste Position einnimmt, in der es von der Mantelfläche des Zylinders (22) abgestellt ist, und im Falle eines Bahnrisses eine zweite Position einnimmt, in der es an die Mantelfläche des Zylinders (22) angestellt ist. Ferner betrifft die Erfindung ein Verfahren zum Verhindern eines Wicklers in einer einen Zylinder (22) aufweisenden Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine, dass sich durch die Verfahrensschritte Erfassen eines Bahnrisses und Bewegen eines Rakelmessers in eine Anstell-Position an den Zylinder (22) im Falle eines Bahnrisses auszeichnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/18; B65H 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/02 (2006.01); B41F 7/02 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B41F 33/18 (2006.01); B65H 26/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/18 (2013.01); B41P 2233/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10052013 A1 20010510; EP 1099553 A2 20010516; EP 1099553 A3 20021211; JP 2001171077 A 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-10-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI