Global Patent Index - EP 1099554 A2

EP 1099554 A2 2001-05-16 - Cleaning web for a press cylinder and cleaning device

Title (en)

Cleaning web for a press cylinder and cleaning device

Title (de)

Druckmaschinenzylinder-Reinigungstuch und -Reinigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Bande de nettoyage pour un cylindre de la presse et dispositif de nettoyage

Publication

EP 1099554 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120824 A

Priority

DE 19954671 A

Abstract (en)

The printing machine cylinder cleaning cloth (10) is transported from a clean cloth spindle (2) via a pressure device (6) with which it is pressed against a rotating cylinder (20) to be cleaned to a dirty cloth spindle (4). The cloth is provided with a machine-readable code for reading in a cleaning device and in the form of markings formed in or on the cloth whose shape forms a machine-readable information content. Independent claims are also included for the following: an printing machine cylinder cleaning device.

Abstract (de)

Druckmaschinenzylinder-Reinigungstuch und -Reinigungsvorrichtung, bei welcher das Reinigungstuch (10) mit einer maschinell lesbaren Codierung zum Lesen in der Reinigungsvorrichtung versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 1/00 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01); B41F 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41P 2235/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099554 A2 20010516; EP 1099554 A3 20010919; EP 1099554 B1 20030820; CN 1295925 A 20010523; DE 19954671 A1 20010517; JP 2001171089 A 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50003349

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160917

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140925

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-05-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040925

2004-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040925

2004-09-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2003-11-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003349 P 20030925

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BALDWIN GERMANY GMBH

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020507

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 35/00 A, 7B 65H 26/00 B

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI