Global Patent Index - EP 1099582 A1

EP 1099582 A1 2001-05-16 - Open roof construction for a vehicle

Title (en)

Open roof construction for a vehicle

Title (de)

Aufbau eines öffnungsfähigen Fahrzeugdaches

Title (fr)

Construction de toit ouvrant pour véhicule

Publication

EP 1099582 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203919 A

Priority

NL 1013564 A

Abstract (en)

What is disclosed is an open roof construction for a vehicle, comprising a frame (3,4) mounted round a roof opening, a movable closure element connected thereto, and driving means for said closure element (6), which are mounted on said frame (3,4). The frame consists of a lower frame (3) present on the underside of the roof (1) and an upper frame (4) present on the upper side of the roof (1), which lower frame (3) and which upper frame (4) include fixing elements (17) for fixing the two frames (3,4) together whilst confining the edges (2) of the roof opening (1). The driving means for the closure element (6) are mounted on said lower frame (3). Said driving means are mounted on the lower frame largely outside the projection of the roof opening. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60J 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 25/06 (2006.01); B60J 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60J 7/022 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099582 A1 20010516; EP 1099582 B1 20040714; DE 60012110 D1 20040819; JP 2001171357 A 20010626; NL 1013564 C2 20010515; US 6390542 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051108

2005-11-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051108

2005-07-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-11-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-10-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-10-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-10-15 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012110 P 20040819

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2003-09-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INALFA ROOF SYSTEMS GROUP B.V.

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI