Global Patent Index - EP 1099586 A2

EP 1099586 A2 2001-05-16 - Tarpaulin cover device for container

Title (en)

Tarpaulin cover device for container

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Abdeckung eines Behälters durch eine Abdeckplane

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la couverture d'un conteneur avec une bâche

Publication

EP 1099586 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123981 A

Priority

DE 19953673 A

Abstract (en)

The device for covering a load in an open lorry comprises a cover (WB) which is wound on a motorised shaft (E0, E1) which extends across the width of the lorry. This is attached to a lever system (H01) which can slide along a guide rail, allowing it to be extended over part of the load container and over different heights of load.

Abstract (de)

Für die automatische Abdeckung eines Behälters, insbesondere eines Transportbehälters eines Lastfahrzeugs, wird eine Vorrichtung vorgeschlagen, bei welcher eine Welle (WE), auf welche eine Abdeckplane (PL) aufgewickelt ist, mittels eines flexiblen Zugelements unter Abwicklung der Plane (PL) von einer Behälterlängsseite zur gegenüberliegenden verlagert wird. Zur Niederhaltung der Querkanten der Abdeckplane (PL) wird der Einsatz einer Klettverschlußverbindung (KV) vorgeschlagen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60J 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 7/08 (2006.01); B65D 88/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/125 (2013.01); B60J 7/085 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2822451 C2 19880519

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19953673 A1 20010510; EP 1099586 A2 20010516; EP 1099586 A3 20020502

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051103

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI