Global Patent Index - EP 1099621 A1

EP 1099621 A1 2001-05-16 - Construction element for building walls, in particular interior walls and/or ceilings, in particular on ships

Title (en)

Construction element for building walls, in particular interior walls and/or ceilings, in particular on ships

Title (de)

Bauelement zur Erstellung von Wänden, insbesondere von Innenwänden, und/oder Decken, insbesondere auf Schiffen

Title (fr)

Elément de construction pour créer des murs, en particulier des murs intérieures et/ou des plafonds, en particulier sur des bateaux

Publication

EP 1099621 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122976 A

Priority

DE 29919825 U

Abstract (en)

The construction element is formed by a square or rectangular multi-layer panel comprising two spaced apart wall panels (20, 120), each comprising an outer panel section (21, 121) made from (calcium) silicate, plaster-based material or cement-based material, bonded by adhesive to an inner panel section (22, 122) formed by a perforated plate or mesh panel made from metal or plastic. An air cushion (27) is formed in the gap cavity (26) between the two panels, or the cavity can be filled with one or more mineral wool layers (28, 28) bonded to the insides of the inner panel sections by e.g. adhesive. U-shaped metal or plastic spacer profiles (30, 130) in the top and bottom of the panel keep the two wall panels spaced apart, the arms being secured to the insides of the inner panel sections by e.g. adhesive.

Abstract (de)

Ein leicht handhabbares nicht brennbares und feuerfestes Bauelement zur Erstellung von Wänden, insbesondere von Innenwänden, und/oder Decken, insbesondere auf Schiffen, besteht aus einer Mehrschichtplatte (10) mit einem rechteckförmigen Zuschnitt aus zwei im Abstand voneinander angeordneten Wandplatten (20;120), von denen jede Wandplatte (20;120) von einer äußeren Platte (21;121) aus Silikat, Calciumsilikat, die auch als gipshaltige Platte oder als Zementplatte ausgebildet ist, und einer inneren als Lochplatte oder Gitterplatte ausgebildeten Platte (22;122) gebildet ist, wobei die inneren Platten (22;122) mit den äußeren Platten (21;121) verklebt sind, wobei in dem von den beiden Wandplatten (20;120) gebildeten Zwischenraum (26) ein Luftpolster (27) ausgebildet oder eine den Zwischenraum (26) ausfüllende Mineralwolleschicht (28) oder zwei Mineralwolleschichten (28';28'') angeordnet sind, die an den Innenwandflächen der inneren Platten (22;122) z.B. vermittels Klebeverbindung angebracht sind, wobei die beiden Wandplatten (20;120) im oberen und im unteren Bereich vermittels U-Profilen (30;130) aus metallischen Werkstoff oder Kunststoff im Abstand gehalten werden, wobei die Schenkel der U-Profile (30;130) mit den Innenwandflächen der inneren Platten (22;122) verklebt oder mechanisch miteinander verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 3/68; B63B 29/02; E04B 1/61; E04B 2/74; E04C 2/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/68 (2006.01); B63B 29/02 (2006.01); E04B 1/61 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 29/025 (2013.01); B63B 3/68 (2013.01); E04B 1/6187 (2013.01); E04B 2/7448 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29919825 U1 20000127; EP 1099621 A1 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031106

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-09-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000502

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI