Global Patent Index - EP 1099622 A2

EP 1099622 A2 2001-05-16 - Integrated towboat system

Title (en)

Integrated towboat system

Title (de)

Integriertes Schleppsystem

Title (fr)

Système de remorquage intégré

Publication

EP 1099622 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00610113 A

Priority

NO 995477 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides an integrated tow boat system including a tow boat, said system further including a powered bow unit module operable by remote control, a navigation bridge equipment module, and a control telemetry module. The powered bow-module (boat) (1) equipped with propellers (30) and steering aids in conjunction with a powered push boat (3) is particularly advantageous for moving barges with goods on water. An outstanding feature of the system is the integrated control of all the propulsion and steering machinery of the two boats through radio communication. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 35/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 35/66 (2006.01); B63H 21/22 (2006.01); B63B 35/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 21/22 (2013.01); B63B 35/665 (2013.01); B63B 35/70 (2013.01); B63B 2035/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1099622 A2 20010516; EP 1099622 A3 20030108; NO 995477 D0 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-10-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI